Multiplying 5, 25, 125




Example 1
516 x 5 = ?

516×5 =516× 10 2 =258×10=2580
Example 2
317 x 5 = ?

317×5 =316×5+5 =316× 10 2 +5 =158×10+5=1585
Example 3
6124 x 25 = ?

6124×25 =6124× 100 4 =1531×100=153100
Example 4
513 x 25 = ?

513×25 =512×25+25 =512× 100 4 +25 =128×100+25=12825
Example 5
216 x 125 = ?

216×125 =216× 1000 8 =27×1000=27000
Example 6
631 x 125 = ?

631×125 =624×125+7×125 =624× 1000 8 +875 =78×1000+875 =78875

0 comments:

Post a Comment