Multiplication of two numbers where the sum of the first digit equal to 10 and the other digits are the same. (36 x 34 = ?)



Conditions:

  1. The sum of the ones digit equal to 10
  2. The other digits are the same
Steps:

  1. The tens digit multiply by another tens digit plus one. In this case, the tens digit is 4, hence we multiply 4 by 5. 4 x 5 = 20. The product will be the last two digits of the answer.
  2. The product of the ones digit of the two numbers will be the first two digit of the answer.

Example 1:
57 x 53 = ?
Answer:
5 x 6 = 30
7 x 3 = 21

57 x 53 = 3,021


Example 2:
81 x 89 = ?
Answer:
8 x 9 = 72
1 x 9 = 9

81 x 89 = 7,209



Example 3:
114 x 116 = ?
Answer:
11 x 12 = 132
4 x 6 = 24

114 x 116 = 13,224


0 comments:

Post a Comment