Multiplying 75, 375, 625 and 875





For multiplication that involve 75, 375, 625 and 875, we can convert them into the fraction form to facilitate the calculation process. Below are a few examples of how this is done.

Example 1:
152 x 75 = ?
Answer:
152×75 =152× 3 4 ×100 =38×3×100 =11400

Example 2:
209 x 75 = ?
Answer:
209×75 =(208+1)×75 =208× 3 4 ×100+75 =52×3×100+75 =15675

Example 3:
744 x 375 = ?
Answer:
744×375 =744× 3 8 ×1000 =93×3×1000 =279000

Example 4:
539 x 375 = ?
Answer:
539×375 =(536+3)×375 =536× 3 8 ×1000+3×375 =67×3×1000+1125 =201000+1125=202125

Example 5:
344 x 625 = ?
Answer:
344×625 =344× 5 8 ×1000 =43×5×1000 =215000

Example 6:
4168 x 875 =
Answer:
4168×875 =4168× 7 8 ×1000 =521×7×1000 =3647000

0 comments:

Post a Comment